what you dont understand about math is. EVERYTHING. How 'elicit, numbers in aii: Mill I illegit THIS"?! I Blir FE: Elf .. I am going to blow... Your mind 1 PLUS equals window
Upload
Login or register
Hide Comments
Leave a comment Refresh Comments (36)
[ 36 comments ]
> hey anon, wanna give your opinion?
asd
#1 - fourtwentt
Reply +44 123456789123345869
(08/05/2014) [-]
I am going to blow...




Your mind
#24 - letmegrabyourass
Reply +15 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
#16 - ridivey
Reply +14 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
this math makes no sense
forgot to log in
User avatar #18 to #16 - faggotishshit
Reply +3 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
Well, to be certain, 50 x 50 - 0 is 2500... so, yeah...
User avatar #19 to #18 - ridivey
Reply -1 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
well yeah, but in the question, you have to answer the original question, and the logic makes no sense. In this scenario, the answer would be 1,002,500 which obviously isn't the answer, therefore tumblr is making people dumber as usual.
User avatar #21 to #19 - rishnock
Reply +5 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
I think you messed up following your flowchart.
Following the logic that you posted yourself, you get your answer as 02500, not 1002500
#20 to #19 - noschool
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
you do know 100-100=0, so it still works it just isn't that useful in this case.
User avatar #35 to #20 - ridivey
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
The math doesn't work any other way either, if you don't believe me try 2 x 2 with this logic. it just doesn't work, tumblr is making people stupid
#36 to #35 - noschool
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
i wasn't saying anything about 2x2 or the validity of all values, i was just saying it worked for 50x50. It does say large numbers and 2 isn't really large, though 50 isn't really large compared to 1 trillion it would seem values less than fifty or greater than 100 wouldn't work but from 50 to 100 it would work.
#14 - anon id: 2bdb86c2
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
2x2=?
100-2=98
98+98=196
98x98=9,604
2x2=1,969,604
User avatar #25 to #14 - treeclimberIoI
Reply +2 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
LARGE numbers you moron.
User avatar #28 to #25 - retrotroglodyte
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
so where exactly does a small number become large?
#29 - sewoyl
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
#4 - anon id: b739e748
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/05/2014) [-]
funny thing:
a) 50 x 50 =?
b) 100-50=50 and 100-50=50
c) so. 50+50=100, and a = 100_
d) _ = 50 x 50? aaaaaaaand we back to a!
#5 to #4 - croc
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/05/2014) [-]
50 x 50= 5 x 5 x 100 = 2500
User avatar #6 to #4 - alonetime
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/05/2014) [-]
well 50 and 50 isnt so hard
50 50
x50 drop the zero x 5 now its just 5*0 and 5*5
------- --------
0


50 50
x 5 x 5
----- --------
00 2500


spacing may vary
User avatar #7 to #6 - alonetime
Reply +1 123456789123345869
(08/05/2014) [-]
well 50 and 50 isnt so hard
50.......................................... 50
x50 .......drop the zero........ x 5 ..........................now its just 5*0 and 5*5
------- ..................................--------
..................................................0


...50.................................... 50 .............but its.............50
...x 5.................................... x 5 ...........actually...........x50
...----- .............................-------- ..................................-------
...00................................. 2500 ..................................2500
#26 to #7 - anon id: 2e43d507
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
1+1=2 get ******* rekt
User avatar #22 to #6 - bagguhsleep
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
It's not about it being hard, it's about it being applicable to the flowchart.
User avatar #37 to #22 - alonetime
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
its about multiplying big numbers in your head

why would we make a special way of solving it? because someone considered multiplying big numbers in their head as hard.

and besides doing 50 and 50 doesn't break the flow chart, it still works
#33 - dashoutout
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
yeah right
#32 - curesian
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/06/2014) [-]
The image works of the following method.
97*96<=>(100-(100-97))*(100-(100-96))<=>(100-3)*(100-4)=100*100-100*4-3*100+3*4
This last bit can be shortened to: 100*(100-3-4)+3*4
The underscored part is the red part of the image and the non-underscored part is the blue part of the image.
This method can be used for any two numbers, but as shown in other comments it's not effective unless it's a high two ciphered number. In my opinion this method is a mere curiosity.
User avatar #3 - zeunfunnyguy
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/05/2014) [-]
well if you have like 47*68 you'll get that 100-47=53 and 100-68 is 32. you'll add them together to make the sum 85. now you just have to solve the simple multiplication 53*32 in your head, or repeat this process.

this thing is only smart if the number you have to multiply are close to 100 or 0 so you can do the multiplication in your head
#2 - adriaan
Reply 0 123456789123345869
(08/05/2014) [-]
now do 56*72, see as difficult as the starting problem
this trick works only works well for both numbers close to 100,1000...
so not that useful
better is to do 50*70+6*70+50*2+6*2

proof of this trick
c*d=e
100-c=a and 100-d=b
than
(100-a)(100-b)=10000-100a-100b+ab=100(100-(a+b))+ab=e


[ 36 comments ]
Leave a comment