Asians. They can raed minds. How Japanese kids learn to multiply in primary school STEP 2: ESE IS. 2, 13 Arlo IS HEN YOU TAKE THOSE . Ate? YOU MO THERE IF LIKE
Home Original Content Funny Pictures Funny GIFs YouTube Funny Text Funny Movies Channels Search

hide menu

Asians

They can raed minds

How Japanese kids learn to multiply
in primary school
STEP 2:
ESE IS.
2, 13 Arlo IS
HEN YOU TAKE THOSE . Ate? YOU MO THERE
IF LIKE Theh...
ANSWER’!
TO GET
YOU TSP.
...
+1183
Views: 52099
Favorited: 806
Submitted: 02/23/2013
Share On Facebook
Add to favorites Subscribe to braveshart E-mail to friend submit to reddit
Share image on facebook Share on StumbleUpon Share on Tumblr Share on Pinterest Share on Google Plus E-mail to friend

Comments(228):

[ 228 comments ]

Show All Replies Show Shortcuts
Show:   Top Rated Controversial Best Lowest Rated Newest Per page:
Order:
What do you think? Give us your opinion. Anonymous comments allowed.
User avatar #5 - imonamouse (02/23/2013) [+] (6 replies)
15
X 23
-----------


this just seems like a lot less work
#62 - xmonke (02/24/2013) [+] (6 replies)
This is the first thing I did when I found out how to do this. (enlarge)
#125 - juha ONLINE (02/24/2013) [-]
I almost learned something
I almost learned something
User avatar #6 - samthediv (02/23/2013) [+] (15 replies)
15x23?
I'd multiply it by 10 to get 230 then divide it by 2 to get 115 then add it to the original 230 which makes 345
Its much simpler.
That method just seems lengthy and annoying
#55 - cumsinbucket (02/24/2013) [+] (4 replies)
The biggest lie a grade school teacher will tell you is that can't always use a calculator.   
In college the only calculator you can't use is a graphing calculator which is barley needed for the test.   
 BITCH ASS ELEMENTARY LIARS
The biggest lie a grade school teacher will tell you is that can't always use a calculator.
In college the only calculator you can't use is a graphing calculator which is barley needed for the test.
BITCH ASS ELEMENTARY LIARS
#77 - shadownavi (02/24/2013) [+] (6 replies)
COMIC SAAAAANS!!!
#100 - captainmargeret (02/24/2013) [-]
that's some useful content
#147 - matralith ONLINE (02/24/2013) [-]
#135 - shippohippo (02/24/2013) [-]
asains just read minds to get their answer
+9
#4 - rainbowadash **User deleted account** has deleted their comment [-]
#120 - xxxsonic fanxxx (02/24/2013) [+] (4 replies)
15x23
i would do 15x20 first =300+(15x3=45)=345
I guess my head simply works that way much better
i always shoot to multiply by a digit that ends with 0 then add or subtract the remainder of the digits such as
9x9
9x10=90-(9x1)=81
#36 - jeekim (02/24/2013) [-]
This isnt for "visual" people..
it just lengthens the time it takes to solve it just to dumb it down from multiplication to addition.
#177 - empithree (02/24/2013) [+] (6 replies)
did you know that:
111.111.111 x 111.111.111 = 12.345. You need to login to view this link
#203 - alexwise (02/24/2013) [-]
I didnt come here to learn!
#178 - sheperdofthestars (02/24/2013) [+] (1 reply)
This is how I learned it. IT actually looks pretty similar to the above method.
This is how I learned it. IT actually looks pretty similar to the above method.
#103 - criponblood (02/24/2013) [-]
i accidentald the learn
#102 - koojot ONLINE (02/24/2013) [+] (9 replies)
I do it this way
15 x 23

10 x 23 = 230
5 x 23 = 115
230 + 115 = 345
or

23 x 15
20 x 15 = 300
3 x 15 = 45
300 + 45 = 345
#116 - cinematicbrix (02/24/2013) [+] (6 replies)
I respect how Japanese study systems work, but why not just do this?

We do this in Finland, and it's like a hundred times easier, and faster, and usually gives better results.
#8 - xxxsonic fanxxx (02/23/2013) [+] (1 reply)
Try this.

15x2=30
15x20=300
30+300=330
+15=345 tada...
[ 228 comments ]
Leave a comment
 Friends (0)